CO SB211 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning limitations on certain debt collection actions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Limitations On Extraordinary Collection Actions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-12 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-211 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 20-211 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.017) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-06 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 15 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-02 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 20-211, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-29 Governor Signed
2020-06-19 Sent to the Governor
2020-06-19HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-06-19SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-06-12HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-11HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-06-10HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-10HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-06-09HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2020-06-08HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations
2020-06-08SenateSenate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2020-06-06SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2020-06-05SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-06-04SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-06-02SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-06-01SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb20-211
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_211_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_211_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_211_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_211_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_211_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_211_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/537e1eee3c0155068725857b006c883e-sb20-211-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-211vote5f55d5
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-211vote5a50a9
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-211vote5c2619
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/82f0c1f2a7a20bc187258582007b641a-sb20-211-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1fea2fc85053047c87258583004fe463-sb20-211-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-211vote61b607

Bill Comments

feedback