CO SB210 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-10 - House Committee on Education Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-10 - House Committee on Education Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Reading Incentive Program Grants
Title
Reading Incentive Program Grants
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to postpone Senate Bill 10-210 indefinitely (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 10-210 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 10-210 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-10 | House Committee on Education Postpone Indefinitely | |
2010-05-07 | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-05-07 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education | |
2010-05-06 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2010-04-30 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |