CO SB206 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-31 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Criminal Record Sealing Clean-up

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Record Sealing Clean-up

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-05-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-206, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-206, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-31SenateGovernor Signed
2014-05-15SenateSent to the Governor
2014-05-15SenateSigned by the Speaker of the House
2014-05-15SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2014-05-05SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2014-05-03HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2014-05-02HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2014-05-01HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2014-04-28HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
2014-04-28SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2014-04-25SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2014-04-23SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2014-04-17SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/38CB616ED7E9FA4987257C9B00753C84?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/38CB616ED7E9FA4987257C9B00753C84/$FILE/206_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/38CB616ED7E9FA4987257C9B00753C84/$FILE/206sjud_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/38CB616ED7E9FA4987257C9B00753C84/$FILE/206_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/38CB616ED7E9FA4987257C9B00753C84/$FILE/206_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/38CB616ED7E9FA4987257C9B00753C84/$FILE/206jud_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/38CB616ED7E9FA4987257C9B00753C84/$FILE/206_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/38CB616ED7E9FA4987257C9B00753C84/$FILE/206_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/38CB616ED7E9FA4987257C9B00753C84/$FILE/206_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/C640FBA6DCE6755D87257CC3006D3F80
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/941AA328E5E6492B87257CC3006D3858
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/DE8E69A95AF11DF787257CCC001012F7
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/37D9D434EB3969F987257CCC0010000C

Bill Comments 750

feedback