CO SB205 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the requirement that employers offer sick leave to their employees, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sick Leave For Employees

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-15 - Joint - CC_SB20-205_2020A: Adopt the First Report of First Conference Committee (Attachment A). (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate: Conference Committee Report Repass (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate: Conference Committee Report Adopt Ccr (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Adopt (Y: 39 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Byd Scp (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Repass (Y: 39 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate: Conference Committee Report Repass (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-13 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Not Concur Appt Cc (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-13 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 38 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.085) (Y: 21 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2020-06-11 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-205 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 20-205 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.058) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-205, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.037 (Attachment D). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-03 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 20-205, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.038 (Attachment E). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-03 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.033 (Attachment C). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-03 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 20-205, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-14 Governor Signed
2020-06-29 Sent to the Governor
2020-06-29HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-06-22SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-06-15SenateSenate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass
2020-06-15SenateSenate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Reconsider - CCR produced
2020-06-15HouseHouse Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass
2020-06-13SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee
2020-06-13HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-12HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor
2020-06-11HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-06-11HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-06-10HouseHouse Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2020-06-09HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance + Appropriations
2020-06-09SenateSenate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2020-06-08SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2020-06-06SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-06-03SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations
2020-05-26SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb20-205
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_205_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_205_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_205_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_205_rv3.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_205_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_205_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d30be8a123fc50208725857c005fb343-sb20-205-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e530a380bdfe11208725857f004d5f2d-sb20-205-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e530a380bdfe11208725857f004d5f2d-sb20-205-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-205vote54516c
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-205vote5413ee
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/8da860f310fc378787258583007cfe4a-sb20-205-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/dd29a9e9ede22bf6872585840050fde9-sb20-205-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-205vote0da675
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-205vote5b084e
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-205vote693d85
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-205vote77d8a8
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-205vote7590ad
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-205vote5dddc4
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-205vote75734b
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-205vote76fb7e
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-205vote77463e
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ec2cbc1ad371ffd587258588006d3bfa-sb20-205-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d30be8a123fc50208725857c005fb343-sb20-205-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d30be8a123fc50208725857c005fb343-sb20-205-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d30be8a123fc50208725857c005fb343-sb20-205-4-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d30be8a123fc50208725857c005fb343-sb20-205-2-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback