CO SB203 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Human Services
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Hearing: Apr 29 @ 1:30 pm in Room Old State Library
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Human Services
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Hearing: Apr 29 @ 1:30 pm in Room Old State Library
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning requiring the Colorado prescription drug affordability review board to consider input from the Colorado rare disease advisory council under certain circumstances.
Title
Prescription Drug Board Consider Rare Disease Advisory Council
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 24-203 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 24-203 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |