CO SB203 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the provision of independent counsel to indigent defendants in municipal courts, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Conflict-free Representation In Municipal Courts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-04 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Adhere (Y: 14 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 36 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-05-02 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-203, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 18-203, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - House Judiciary: This is a conceptual amendment L.008 (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 18-203, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-203 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 18-203, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.007 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 18-203, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Adhere (Y: 14 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 36 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-05-02 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-203, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 18-203, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - House Judiciary: This is a conceptual amendment L.008 (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 18-203, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-203 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 18-203, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.007 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 18-203, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-01 | Governor Signed | |
2018-05-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-05-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2018-05-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-05-02 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-05-02 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-27 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2018-04-20 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |