CO SB198 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning public participation in the review by the commissioner of insurance of the acquisition of control of an insurer that offers health plans, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Public Participate Review Acquire Control Insurer
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-198 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer Senate Bill 17-198 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-198, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.005. (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 17-198, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 17-198, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-198 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer Senate Bill 17-198 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-198, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.005. (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 17-198, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 17-198, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-02 | Governor Signed | |
2017-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-18 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-05-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-05-02 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2017-05-02 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-04-27 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2017-04-12 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |