CO SB198 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Reduce Late Vehicle Registration Fees
Title
Reduce Late Vehicle Registration Fees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 10-198 to the Committee on Appropriations with favorable recommendation (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - cow (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved that Senate Bill 10-198 be referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - cow (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved that Senate Bill 10-198 be referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-07 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2010-05-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-05-20 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-05-19 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2010-05-11 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2010-05-10 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed | |
2010-05-10 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2010-05-10 | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations | |
2010-05-07 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2010-05-07 | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs + Appropriations | |
2010-05-06 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed | |
2010-05-06 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2010-05-03 | Senate Committee on State, Veterans & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations | |
2010-04-23 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans & Military Affairs + Appropriations |