CO SB195 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-23 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-23 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Parking For Persons With Disabilities
Title
Parking For Persons With Disabilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-195 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-195 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-195 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-195, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-195, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-195, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-195 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-195 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-195, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-195, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-195, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-23 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2011-05-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-10 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2011-05-09 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-05-03 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-02 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed | |
2011-04-29 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-04-26 | House Committee on Health and Environment Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-04-18 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health and Environment | |
2011-04-13 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-12 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-06 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-03-31 | Senate Committee on Health and Human Services Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2011-03-15 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health and Human Services |