CO SB194 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning an exception to the statutory deadlines for making income tax refunds for returns suspected of refund-related fraud.
Title
Exception To Deadlines Due To Refund-related Fraud
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-15 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 17-194 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 17-194 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 17-194 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 17-194 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | Governor Signed | |
2017-03-23 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-03-22 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-03-15 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-14 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-13 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-03-08 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-02 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |