CO SB192 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning changes to the law requiring persons in the business of selling motor vehicles to make a consumer whole if the motor vehicle fails to perform, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Motor Vehicle Lemon Law
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-07 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 50 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-03 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-192 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer Senate Bill 24-192 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-192, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 24-192, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-03 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-192 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer Senate Bill 24-192 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-192, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 24-192, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-06 | Governor Signed | |
2024-05-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2024-05-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2024-05-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-05-07 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-05-06 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2024-05-03 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-05-01 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2024-04-29 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/26/2024 - No Amendments |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |