CO SB188 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-18 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-18 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Landowner Preference Wildlife Hunting License
Title
Landowner Preference Wildlife Hunting License
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-188 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-188 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-188 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-188 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-188, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-03-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-03-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-188, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-03-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-03-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 13-188 to the Committee on Appropriations, as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 13-188 to the Committee on Appropriations, as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-188 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-188 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-188 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-188, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-03-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-03-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-188, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-03-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-03-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 13-188 to the Committee on Appropriations, as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 13-188 to the Committee on Appropriations, as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-18 | Senate | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-04-22 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-19 | House | House Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-17 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-04-10 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy |