CO SB183 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the authority for the department of military and veterans affairs to make grants related to the USS Colorado, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Support USS Colorado Commissioning
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Gardner [R] | Sen. Pete Lee [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-183 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 17-183 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Conceptual amendment to drop approp to 100K (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-183, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 17-183 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-183 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 17-183 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Conceptual amendment to drop approp to 100K (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-183, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 17-183 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-05 | Governor Signed | |
2017-05-19 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-05-09 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-05-08 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2017-05-08 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-05-08 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2017-05-08 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government |