CO SB183 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-10 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-10 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Water Conservation Common Interest Communities
Title
Water Conservation Common Interest Communities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-183, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007. Representative Fields discussed the purpose of the amendment (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-04-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007. Representative Fields discussed the purpose of the amendment (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-04-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-183, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 001 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 13-183 to the Committee of the Whole, as amended (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 001 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 13-183 to the Committee of the Whole, as amended (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007. Representative Fields discussed the purpose of the amendment (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-04-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007. Representative Fields discussed the purpose of the amendment (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-04-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-183, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 001 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 13-183 to the Committee of the Whole, as amended (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 001 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 13-183 to the Committee of the Whole, as amended (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-10 | Senate | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2013-04-22 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-19 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-15 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-04-11 | House | House Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced In House - Assigned to Local Government |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government |