CO SB181 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning measures to improve outcomes for defendants who may be found incompetent to proceed.
Title
Measures On Incompetent To Proceed
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-12 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 20-181 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-181, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment G) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 20-181, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 20-181, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 20-181 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-181, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment G) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 20-181, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 20-181, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Governor Signed | |
2020-06-19 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-06-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-06-12 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-11 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-06-10 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-09 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-06-05 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2020-06-05 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |