CO SB181 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - House Committee on Energy & Environment Refer Unamended to Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning additional public welfare protections regarding the conduct of oil and gas operations, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protect Public Welfare Oil And Gas Operations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-18 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer Senate Bill 19-181 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Layover SB 181 to next Senate Appropriations meeting (Y: 4 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-181, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-181, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment K). (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 19-181, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.014 (Attachment N). (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.012 (Attachment M). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment L). (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 19-181, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18HouseHouse Committee on Energy & Environment Refer Unamended to Finance
2019-03-14HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Energy & Environment + Finance + Appropriations
2019-03-13SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-12SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2019-03-08SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-03-07SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2019-03-05SenateSenate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Finance
2019-03-01SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb19-181
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_181_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_181_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_181_ren.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2f71132b2dd15da1872583b40073cc8d-sb19-181-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e7ed252a250baf56872583b6005e0e85-sb19-181-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2f71132b2dd15da1872583b40073cc8d-sb19-181-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2f71132b2dd15da1872583b40073cc8d-sb19-181-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2f71132b2dd15da1872583b40073cc8d-sb19-181-4-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2f71132b2dd15da1872583b40073cc8d-sb19-181-5-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2f71132b2dd15da1872583b40073cc8d-sb19-181-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4be42ba2c7ba2ae9872583b700519347-sb19-181-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4be42ba2c7ba2ae9872583b700519347-sb19-181-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4be42ba2c7ba2ae9872583b700519347-sb19-181-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-181vote0df7ed
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-181vote57e9aa
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/10f78f4eafd31a13872583c1006ba2eb-sb19-181-0-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback