CO SB181 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Municipal Authority To Lease Land
Title
Municipal Authority To Lease Land
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 10-181 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-03-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 10-181 to the Committee of the Whole, without amendment, and with a recommendation that it be added to the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-03-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 10-181 to the Committee of the Whole, without amendment, and with a recommendation that it be added to the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-07 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2010-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-05-18 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2010-05-18 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-05-04 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2010-04-29 | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-04-28 | House Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-27 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-04-22 | House Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2010-04-13 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2010-04-13 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Local Government | |
2010-04-12 | Senate Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-05 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-03-30 | Senate Committee on Local Government and Energy Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2010-03-11 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government and Energy |