CO SB178 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on May 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-28 - House Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on May 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-28 - House Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a license plate to honor women veterans who have disabilities, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Woman Veteran Disability License Plate
Sponsors
Sen. Rachel Zenzinger [D] | Sen. Jessie Danielson [D] | Rep. Terri Carver [R] | Sen. Dafna Michaelson Jenet [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-28 - House - House Finance: Postpone Senate Bill 20-178 indefinitely. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-178, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment C). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 20-178, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment D). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 20-178, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-178, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment C). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 20-178, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment D). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 20-178, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-28 | House | House Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely |
2020-03-11 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |