CO SB178 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning prohibiting a court from requiring a medical-marijuana patient to abstain from the use of marijuana as a condition of bond.
Title
Marijuana Use As A Condition Of Bond
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 17-178 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 17-178 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 17-178 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 17-178 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-06 | Governor Signed | |
2017-04-03 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-03-31 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-03-27 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-24 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-21 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |