CO SB175 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-18 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-18 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Wildlife Habitat Stamp Programs Continuation
Title
Wildlife Habitat Stamp Programs Continuation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-175 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-175 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-175 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment D) (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt conceptual amendment to L.007 (Attachment B) to add "or threatened" after "endangered" and before "species" in line 6 (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment C) (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment D) (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt conceptual amendment to L.007 (Attachment B) to add "or threatened" after "endangered" and before "species" in line 6 (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment C) (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-175 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 4-2. (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 4-2. (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 13-175 to the Committee on Appropriations, without amendment (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 13-175 to the Committee on Appropriations, without amendment (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-175 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-175 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment D) (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt conceptual amendment to L.007 (Attachment B) to add "or threatened" after "endangered" and before "species" in line 6 (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment C) (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment D) (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt conceptual amendment to L.007 (Attachment B) to add "or threatened" after "endangered" and before "species" in line 6 (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment C) (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-175 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 4-2. (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 4-2. (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 13-175 to the Committee on Appropriations, without amendment (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 13-175 to the Committee on Appropriations, without amendment (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-18 | Senate | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2013-04-22 | House | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-19 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-19 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-03-18 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy |