CO SB174 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the allocation of money by the Colorado commission on higher education for tuition assistance for members of the National Guard.
Title
Allocation Of Money For National Guard Tuition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-16 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-174 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-174 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-14 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-174 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-174 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-01 | Governor Signed | |
2017-02-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-02-22 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-02-16 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-02-15 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2017-02-14 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-02-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |