CO SB174 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-16 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-16 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
CO Water Conservation Bd Construction Fund Project
Title
CO Water Conservation Bd Construction Fund Project
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-10 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-174 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-174 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-174, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-174, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 16 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-174 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-174 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-174, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-174 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-174 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-174, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-174, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 16 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-174 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-174 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-174, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-16 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2016-05-10 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-05-08 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2016-05-05 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2016-05-05 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2016-05-02 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2016-04-26 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy |