CO SB173 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-7)
Status: Passed on June 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-7)
Status: Passed on June 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning recommendations of the Colorado child support commission.
Title
Colorado Child Support Commission Recommendations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-08 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-06 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 23-173 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 23-173, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment D). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 23-173 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 23-173, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment D). (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 23-173, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-06 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 23-173 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 23-173, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment D). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 23-173 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 23-173, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment D). (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 23-173, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-02 | Governor Signed | |
2023-05-15 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-15 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2023-05-06 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-05-04 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2023-05-03 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2023-05-02 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2023-04-28 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2023-04-18 | House | House Committee on Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2023-04-13 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |