CO SB167 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-02 - House Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-02 - House Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Opportunity Schools Pilot Initiative
Title
Opportunity Schools Pilot Initiative
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Postpone Senate Bill 14-167 indefinitely (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-167 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-167, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-167, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-167 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-167, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-167, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely |
2014-04-28 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2014-04-16 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |