CO SB166 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-04 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-04 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Synchronize Econ Dev Reports & Req Annual Report
Title
Synchronize Econ Dev Reports & Req Annual Report
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L.002 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-166, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L.002 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-166, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-166 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-166 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-166, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L.002 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-166, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-166 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-166 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-04 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2012-05-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2012-05-09 | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2012-05-08 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2012-05-07 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-05-04 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-05-02 | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2012-04-27 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance | |
2012-04-24 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-23 | Senate Second Reading Passed | |
2012-04-16 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-04-11 | Senate Committee on Business, Labor and Technology Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2012-03-30 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor and Technology |