CO SB165 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-16 - House Third Reading Lost - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-16 - House Third Reading Lost - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a supplemental appropriation to the department of law.
Title
Supplemental Appropriations Department of Law
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-16 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-02-14 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-165 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-165 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-165 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-165 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-16 | House | House Third Reading Lost - No Amendments |
2017-02-15 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2017-02-14 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-02-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |