CO SB165 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-09 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-09 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
K-12 Academic Growth Performance Eval 2014-15
Title
K-12 Academic Growth Performance Eval 2014-15
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment H) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-04-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-165, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-165 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-165, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-165 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-09 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Reconsider |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2014-04-15 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-14 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2014-04-09 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-04-01 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-01 | House | Senate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |