CO SB162 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning updating Colorado's statutory provisions related to foster care prevention services in the context of the federal "Family First Prevention Services Act", and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Changes Related To Federal Family First Policy
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-12 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 20-162 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-162 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-162, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 20-162, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 20-162, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 20-162 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-162 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-162, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 20-162, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 20-162, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Governor Signed | |
2020-06-19 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-06-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-06-12 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-11 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-11 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-06-11 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2020-06-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |