CO SB162 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Medicaid Recipient Access To Medical Professionals
Title
Medicaid Recipient Access To Medical Professionals
Sponsors
Sen. John Tate [R] | Rep. Jovan Melton [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-162 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Postpone Senate Bill 16-162 indefinitely (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-162 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Postpone Senate Bill 16-162 indefinitely (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001(Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-162, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-162, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Postpone Senate Bill 16-162 indefinitely (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-162 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Postpone Senate Bill 16-162 indefinitely (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001(Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-162, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-162, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-04 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2016-05-02 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |