CO SB162 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sunset Examining Board Of Plumbers
Title
Sunset Examining Board Of Plumbers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-162 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-162 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW AMD The motion passed on a vote of 6-1. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW AMD The motion passed on a vote of 6-1. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-162, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-162, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-162 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW AMD The motion passed on a vote of 6-1. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW AMD The motion passed on a vote of 6-1. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-162, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-162, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-24 | Senate | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-01 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-30 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed |
2013-04-25 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-04-23 | House | House Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |