CO SB152 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-14 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-14 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Info To Mandatory Reporter Child Abuse
Title
Info To Mandatory Reporter Child Abuse
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 10-152, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 10-152 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 10-152 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-14 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2010-05-10 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-05-10 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2010-05-10 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-04-09 | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2010-04-05 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2010-04-01 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-26 | House Second Reading Laid Over to 04/01/2010 | |
2010-03-22 | House Committee on Health and Human Services Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2010-03-04 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health and Human Services | |
2010-03-03 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2010-03-02 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-02-22 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-02-17 | Senate Committee on Health and Human Services Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2010-02-04 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health and Human Services |