CO SB151 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sunset Review Massage Therapists
Title
Sunset Review Massage Therapists
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-151, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.003 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-151, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.003 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-151 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-151 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-03-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-151, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-03-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-151, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW AMD The motion passed on a vote of 4-3 (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed on a vote of 4-3. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW AMD The motion passed on a vote of 4-3 (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed on a vote of 4-3. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.002 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-151, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.002 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-151, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.003 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-151, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.003 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-151 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-151 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-03-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-151, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-03-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-151, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW AMD The motion passed on a vote of 4-3 (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed on a vote of 4-3. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW AMD The motion passed on a vote of 4-3 (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed on a vote of 4-3. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.002 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-151, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.002 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-151, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-24 | Senate | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2013-04-22 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-19 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-19 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-03-28 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2013-03-21 | House | House Committee on Health, Insurance & Environment Refer Amended to Finance |
2013-03-07 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance & Environment |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |