CO SB147 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-05 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-05 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Workers' Compensation Liability Statutory Employer
Title
Workers' Compensation Liability Statutory Employer
Sponsors
Sen. Cheri Jahn [D] | Sen. Bob Gardner [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-147 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-147 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-147, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-147, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-147 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-147, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-147, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-05 | Senate | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-08 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-05-03 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-05-02 | House | House Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-25 | House | House Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |