CO SB138 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-28 - Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 12/31/2020 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-28 - Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 12/31/2020 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning increased consumer protection for homeowners seeking relief for construction defects.
Title
Consumer Protection Construction Defect Time Period
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 20-138 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-28 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 12/31/2020 - No Amendments |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 03/16/2020 - No Amendments |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 03/13/2020 - No Amendments |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 03/06/2020 - No Amendments |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 02/28/2020 - No Amendments |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 02/21/2020 - No Amendments |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |