CO SB137 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the continuation of the Colorado health service corps advisory council.
Title
Sunset Health Service Corps Advisory Council
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-137 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer Senate Bill 17-137 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 17-137 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-137 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer Senate Bill 17-137 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 17-137 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | Governor Signed | |
2017-04-13 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-04-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-31 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-31 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-09 | House | House Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2017-02-22 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |