CO SB134 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the exemption of nonprofit water companies from regulation by the public utilities commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Utilities Commission Deregulate Nonprofit Water Utilities

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-02 Governor Signed
2018-03-22 Sent to the Governor
2018-03-22HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2018-03-21SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2018-03-16HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-03-15HouseHouse Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-03-12HouseHouse Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2018-02-20HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources
2018-02-14SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-02-13SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2018-02-08SenateSenate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2018-01-29SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb18-134
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_134_01.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_134_eng.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_134_ren.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_134_rev.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_134_rer.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_134_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sagr2018a2018-02-08t133045z-sb18-134-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sagr2018a2018-02-08t133045z-sb18-134-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb18-134vote59ba28
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hagr2018a2018-03-12t133538z-sb18-134-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb18-134vote57d8c2

Bill Comments

feedback