CO SB128 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the repeal of an obsolete provision that required the department of transportation to make recommendations to the general assembly by 2011.
Title
Repeal Colorado Department of Transportation 2011 Recommendation Requirement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 24-128 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 24-128 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 24-128 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 24-128 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | Governor Signed | |
2024-04-12 | Sent to the Governor | |
2024-04-12 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-04-04 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-03 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-01 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-03-26 | House | House Committee on Transportation, Housing & Local Government Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-23 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation, Housing & Local Government |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |