CO SB128 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-14 - House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-14 - House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a restriction on a state agency's authority to increase a fee.
Title
Legislative Approval For State Agency Fee Increase
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-14 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Postpone Senate Bill 18-128 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Postpone Senate Bill 18-128 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 18-128 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Postpone Senate Bill 18-128 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 18-128 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-14 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2018-02-26 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |