CO SB127 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the repeal of the department of revenue's requirement to publish an historical explanation of income tax rate modifications enacted in the state on every income tax return form.
Title
Repeal Publishing Requirement DOR Department Of Revenue Income Tax Rate Modifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 18-127 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 18-127, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 18-127, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 18-127 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 18-127, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 18-127, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Governor Signed | |
2018-04-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-04-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-04-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-02 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-29 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 04/02/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-03-28 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/29/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-03-27 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/28/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-03-26 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/27/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-03-23 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/26/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-03-21 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-02-15 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |