CO SB124 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the removal of the thirty-day waiting period related to the sale of imported alcohol beverages.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Imported Alcohol Beverages Waiting Period

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer Senate Bill 18-124 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 18-124 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-07 Governor Signed
2018-03-02 Sent to the Governor
2018-03-02HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2018-03-01SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2018-02-27HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-02-26HouseHouse Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-02-23HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 02/26/2018 - No Amendments
2018-02-20HouseHouse Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2018-02-13HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor
2018-02-09SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-02-08SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-02-05SenateSenate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2018-01-29SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb18-124
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_124_01.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_124_eng.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_124_ren.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_124_rev.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_124_rer.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_124_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sblt2018a2018-02-05t133108z-sb18-124-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb18-124vote5a1dfc
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hbus2018a2018-02-20t133029z-sb18-124-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb18-124vote5ba616

Bill Comments 750

feedback