CO SB122 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - House Committee on Judiciary Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - House Committee on Judiciary Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning clarifying that certain deputy sheriffs may serve without attaining certification from the peace officers standards and training board.
Title
Deputy Sheriffs No Peace Officers Standards And Training Certification
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-05 - House - House Judiciary: Postpone Senate Bill 18-122 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - House Judiciary: Postpone Senate Bill 18-122 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 18-122 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - House Judiciary: Postpone Senate Bill 18-122 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 18-122 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-05 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Postpone Indefinitely |
2018-03-22 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2018-02-15 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |