CO SB120 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-15 - House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-15 - House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the requirement of United States citizenship to be a peace officer in Colorado.
Title
Require United States Citizenship For Colorado Peace Officers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-15 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Postpone Senate Bill 17-120 indefinitely. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Postpone Senate Bill 17-120 indefinitely. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 17-120, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 17-120, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Postpone Senate Bill 17-120 indefinitely. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 17-120, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 17-120, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-15 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2017-02-21 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 02/17/2017 - No Amendments |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |