CO SB118 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Seller Financing Mortgage Loan Originator Exempt
Title
Seller Financing Mortgage Loan Originator Exempt
Sponsors
Sen. Mary Hodge [D] | Rep. Daniel Pabon [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-118 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-118 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-118, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-118, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole to the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-118 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-118, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-118, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole to the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-22 | Senate | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-03-11 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-03-08 | House | House Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-05 | House | House Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-02-18 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |