CO SB116 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-31 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-31 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Change Orders On Public Works Contracts
Title
Change Orders On Public Works Contracts
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Kopp [R] | Rep. Joe Rice [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 10-116 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 10-116, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 10-116, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-31 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2010-03-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-03-22 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2010-03-22 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-03-16 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2010-03-15 | House Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-10 | House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor | |
2010-02-26 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2010-02-25 | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-02-24 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-02-22 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-02-17 | Senate Committee on Business, Labor and Technology Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2010-01-28 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor and Technology |