CO SB114 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the "Uniform Registration of Canadian Money Judgments Act".
Title
Registration Of Canadian Money Judgments Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 20-114 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 20-114 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 20-114 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 20-114 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-23 | Governor Signed | |
2020-03-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-03-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-11 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-03-10 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-03-05 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-12 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |