CO SB109 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Medical Marijuana Dr Patient Relations
Title
Medical Marijuana Dr Patient Relations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt the draft conference committee report CLSB 109.002 (Attachment A), as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt CLSB109.001, as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 10-109, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations with a favorable recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Move to Committee of Whole (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 10-109, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt CLSB109.001, as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 10-109, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations with a favorable recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Move to Committee of Whole (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 10-109, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-07 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2010-05-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-05-20 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-05-19 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Consideration of Second Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass | |
2010-05-04 | House Consideration of Second Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass | |
2010-04-22 | Second Conference Committee Result was to Adopt Rerevised w/ Amendments | |
2010-04-19 | Senate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Assent to Appointment of New Conference Committee | |
2010-04-16 | House Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Reject, Discharge and Appoint | |
2010-04-08 | First Conference Committee Result was to Adopt Rerevised w/ Amendments | |
2010-03-26 | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee | |
2010-03-25 | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Lay Over | |
2010-03-18 | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily | |
2010-03-03 | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-02 | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-03-01 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-02-26 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-02-12 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2010-02-04 | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2010-02-02 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary + Appropriations | |
2010-02-01 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2010-01-29 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments | |
2010-01-29 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2010-01-27 | Senate Committee on Health and Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2010-01-20 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health and Human Services + Appropriations |