CO SB104 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 15 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the elimination of duplicate regulation of the property of a school district, district charter school, or institute charter school.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elimination Of Duplicate Regulation Of School Building

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.009) (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 49 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 19-104 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-104 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 19-104, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 19-104, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 19-104, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-15HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-05-14SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-30SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2019-04-30SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2019-04-27HouseHouse Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2019-04-26HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor
2019-04-25HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-24HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-23HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-22HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-18HouseHouse Committee on Education Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-04-15HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Education
2019-04-15SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-12SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-04-12SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-03-20SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations
2019-01-23SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb19-104
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_104_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_104_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_104_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_104_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_104_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_104_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/52b593f2ba912b8b872583c300714c22-sb19-104-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f502f68211eadae1872583da004bde24-sb19-104-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-104vote5acfba
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/52b593f2ba912b8b872583c300714c22-sb19-104-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1e15b80b24204283872583e0006b7929-sb19-104-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-104vote6bea7c
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-104vote6bb54a
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-104vote6bd227
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-104vote3ca381
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-104vote3caedd

Bill Comments

feedback