CO SB103 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Passed on March 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Passed on March 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning technical changes to Colorado department of labor and employment statutes.
Title
Labor & Employment Statutes Technical Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer Senate Bill 24-103 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 24-103 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer Senate Bill 24-103 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 24-103 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-22 | Governor Signed | |
2024-03-21 | Sent to the Governor | |
2024-03-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-03-11 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-08 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-07 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-23 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 02/20/2024 - No Amendments |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |