CO SB103 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sunset Compliance Advisory Panel
Title
Sunset Compliance Advisory Panel
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-103 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-103 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-103 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-03 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-03-17 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-03-16 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2015-03-13 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2015-03-10 | House | House Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-02-24 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |