CO SB102 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the requirement for an odometer reading when a motor vehicle's identification number is physically verified.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Odometer Reading Physical Vehicle Identification Number Verification

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 18-102 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Adopt amendment L.001 [Attachment A] (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Refer Senate Bill 18-102, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-29 Governor Signed
2018-03-22 Sent to the Governor
2018-03-22HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2018-03-21SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2018-03-14HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-03-13HouseHouse Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-03-08HouseHouse Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2018-02-13HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy
2018-02-12SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-02-09SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2018-02-06SenateSenate Committee on Transportation Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2018-01-22SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb18-102
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_102_01.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_102_eng.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_102_ren.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_102_rev.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_102_rer.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_102_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/stra2018a2018-02-06t135943z-sb18-102-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/stra2018a2018-02-06t135943z-sb18-102-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb18-102vote60ab21
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/htra2018a2018-03-08t105451z-sb18-102-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb18-102vote5587dd

Bill Comments

feedback